This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/21/2018 at 16:37:09 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, et al vs. JOSEPH G BRINKMAN, et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2009 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOSEPH G BRINKMAN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERIQUST MORTGAGE SECURITIES TRUST

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

UNKNOWN PERSON S

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH G BRINKMAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHERYL Q SACINO

BRINKMAN, JOSEPH G

Largo, FL 33770

CHASE BANK USA N A

SACINO, SHERYL Q

Largo, FL 33770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN D LADOUCEUR

Attorney at CLARFIELD OKON SALOMONE P L

1000 600 N Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

RON G RICE, JR

Attorney at PRIVATE CAPITAL LAW GROUP P L

5645 Coral Ridge Dr Ste 102

Coral Springs, FL 33076

EMILY A DILLON

Attorney at CLARFIELD OKON SALOMONE

500 S Australian Ave Ste 825

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorney

ANN SMITH PELLEGRINO

2215 W Vina Del Mar Blvd

St Petersburg, FL 33706

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL NOTICE

10/10/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

10/10/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

DISMISSAL NOTICE

10/10/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF SALE

03/13/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/15/2015: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

WITNESS LIST

01/13/2015: WITNESS LIST

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

11/12/2014: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

EXHIBIT

10/22/2014: EXHIBIT

RESPONSE

10/22/2014: RESPONSE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/21/2014: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE

10/20/2014: NOTICE

ATTACHMENT

10/20/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

10/20/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

EXHIBIT

09/30/2013: EXHIBIT

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

09/30/2013: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

08/19/2013: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/12/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

ASSIGNMENT

04/17/2015: ASSIGNMENT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18770, Page 1130, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; DEUTSHCE BANK NATIONAL TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • ASSIGNMENT; OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; OF MEDIATION 03/09/15 10:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL. MAGISTRATE; FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 015 BY 7353 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 119.00; Total Payments and Credits; 119.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-03412; Steven Clarfield; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 119.00; Total Payments and Credits; 119.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 119.00; Total Payments and Credits; 119.00; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-03171; Steven Clarfield; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment; 119.00; Total Payments and Credits; 119.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; AMERIQUST MORTGAGE SECURITIES TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 1,065.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,065.40; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-14148; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; (1,065.40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; AMERIQUST MORTGAGE SECURITIES TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 1,065.40; Total Payments and Credits; 1,065.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,065.40

    Read MoreRead Less