This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/21/2018 at 12:17:18 (UTC).

CRAIG R WOLFE VS. CITY OF ST PETERSBURG, et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2009 CRAIG R WOLFE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF ST PETERSBURG,. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLFE, CRAIG R

Defendants

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

ICON CONSULTANT GROUP INC

ST PETERSBURG CITY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R STANLEY GIPE

Attorney at PAPA & GIPE PA

1724 Gulf To Bay Blvd

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant Attorneys

KENNETH V WILSON

Attorney at ASST ATTY GENERAL

501 E Kennedy Blvd Suite 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

EDWARD O SAVITZ

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P A

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

STEPHEN B FRENCH

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P A

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601-3913

JOSEPH P PATNER

Attorney at ASSISTANT CITY ATTY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

06/07/2016: CERTIFICATE

NOTICE

07/28/2016: NOTICE

EXHIBIT

07/03/2013: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

02/19/2016: ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME

MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT

11/18/2013: MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

03/13/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/09/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER

10/23/2013: ORDER

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; WITH PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 19553, Page 61, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketDISMISSED-MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketJOINT MOTION; FOR ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 121516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER; W/PREJUDICE AS TO ALGIRDAS BOBELIS / SCOBO INCORPORATED; Vol./Book 19453, Page 2308, 2 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION; FOR DISMISSALOF STEVE KRANIAS / TINA KRANIAS W/PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; BY PLTF OF DEFTS STEVE KRANIAS / TINA KRANIAS W/PREJUDICE; Vol./Book 19439, Page 2026, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECEIVED BY COURT 082916

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PRE-TRIAL/TRIAL - RECEIVED BY COURT 090216

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
386 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (6); VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (6); VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketSummons - Fee Paid $; Comment: SUMMONS FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketAdditional Party Fee Paid $; Comment: ADDITIONAL PARTY FEE PAID - $2.50; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketCircuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $400.00; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketATTORNEY COVER LETTER; Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketTHIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 007 BY 5445 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketCASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN FRENCH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH P PATNER