This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 17:57:36 (UTC).

CITIMORTGAGE INC vs. KEVIN P HARRIS, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2009 CITIMORTGAGE INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KEVIN P HARRIS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

TENANT 1

Clearwater, FL 33760

TENANT 2

Clearwater, FL 33760

HARRIS, KEVIN P

Clearwater, FL 33760

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

THOMAS, THELMA

St Petersburg, FL 33705

TITA-HARRIS, TANYA M

Clearwater, FL 33760

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BETZY FALGAS

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID PL

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

ZACHARY SMITH

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID PL

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

IRMA QURESHI

Attorney at ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ SCHNEID

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

BENJAMIN LADOUCEUR

Attorney at CLARFIELD OKON SALOMONE P L

500 S Australian Ave Ste 825

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM A TIEDER

Attorney at BLAXBERG & ASSOCIATES

2047 Fifth Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL NOTICE

08/15/2014: DISMISSAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/15/2016: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ATTACHMENT

02/12/2016: ATTACHMENT

AFFIDAVIT

02/12/2016: AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT

02/12/2016: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

01/21/2016: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

EXHIBIT

01/18/2016: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

01/15/2016: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

EXHIBIT

01/14/2016: EXHIBIT

CERTIFICATE

03/17/2015: CERTIFICATE

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

03/06/2015: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO

NOTICE

10/22/2014: NOTICE

NOTICE TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL

10/14/2014: NOTICE TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL

NOTICE

09/05/2013: NOTICE

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

08/16/2013: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

07/30/2013: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

06/13/2013: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION

02/15/2016: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2016
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • ORDER RELEASE ORIG DOC(S) FROM COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCEL LIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 19085, Page 1652, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • NOTICE; OF JOINT DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION; TO ENFORC E SETTLEMENT/MODIFICATION OR ALTERNATIVELY CONTINUE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2009
  • Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $; Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $5.00; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • Circuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $300.00; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; VER: N; K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 020 BY 6574 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CITIMORTGAGE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 18.50; Total Payments and Credits; 18.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-05870; CITIMORTGAGE INC; (18.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CITIMORTGAGE INC; Total Financial Assessment; 18.50; Total Payments and Credits; 18.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less