This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 11:14:45 (UTC).

CITIBANK N A vs. PAUL L DUDA, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2009 CITIBANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAUL L DUDA. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK N A

WILMINGTON TRUST NA AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK NA AS TRUSTEE ETC

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES

DUDA, PAUL L

St Petersburg, FL 33716

HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WINDWARD POINTE

3001 Executive Drive Ste 260

Clearwater, FL 33762

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR 123 LOAN LLC

1818 Library Street Suite 300

Reston, VA 20190

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL L DUDA

St Petersburg, FL 33716

UNKNOWN TENANT I

St Petersburg, FL 33716

UNKNOWN TENANT II

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KARA L FREDRICKSON

Attorney at BROCK AND SCOTT PLLC

2001 Nw 64 St Ste 130

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

DEREK L METTS

3185 S Conway Rd Ste E Attorney At Law

Orlando, FL 32812

LORIANN WOOTTEN

Attorney at BUTLER AND HOSCH P A

3185 S Conway Rd Suite E

Orlando, FL 32812-7315

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT P KIERNAN

Attorney at BECKER & POLIAKOFF PA

100 Whetstone Pl Ste 302

St Augustine, FL 32086

EMILY J HANSEN-BROWN

Attorney at TAYLOR AND CARLS PA

111 N Orange Ave Suite 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

UTA S GROVE

Attorney at GROVE AND CINTON

2600 E Bay Dr Ste 220

Largo, FL 33771

PAUL T HINCKLEY

Attorney at BECKER AND POLIAKOFF PA

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/26/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE W FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

01/06/2015: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

12/15/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

EXHIBIT

12/15/2014: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

12/15/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/16/2014: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

07/29/2014: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

ATTACHMENT

07/29/2014: ATTACHMENT

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

06/27/2014: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL

EXHIBIT

04/16/2014: EXHIBIT

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/16/2014: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

04/01/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/14/2013: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/14/2013: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2013: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE

07/23/2013: NOTICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/19/2013: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

05/15/2013: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE; COPY OF CERTIFICATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF NO DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18759, Page 1006, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; WILMINGTON TRUST NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Vol./Book 18693, Page 716, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 008 BY 2682 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-13636; SHAPIRO FISHMAN AND GACHE LLP; (42.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 42.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-03142; Celeste Vilonna; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-03042; Celeste Vilonna; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; WILMINGTON TRUST NA; Total Financial Assessment; 161.70; Total Payments and Credits; 161.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less