This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 06:45:58 (UTC).

CHRISTIANA TRUST Vs. GREG A O'BRIEN, et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 CHRISTIANA TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GREG A O'BRIEN. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. ARNOLD, JACK R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. ARNOLD, JACK R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB ETC

Petitioner

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING L P

Appellant

CHRISTIANA TRUST

Defendants and Appellees

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

DOE, JANE

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

DOE, JOHN

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

OAKLEAF VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

OBRIEN, GREGG A

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

OBRIEN, LADONNA K

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMES J SPANOLIOS

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN GACHE LLP

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

ANTHONY J SOLOMON

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC

201 E Pine St Ste 730

Orlando, FL 32801

NICOLE ROTHSTEIN

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC

201 E Pine St Ste 730

Orlando, FL 32801

ANTHONY D VAMVAS, ESQ

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC

201 East Pine Street Suite 730

Orlando, FL 32801

TED H MCCASKILL

Attorney at STOREY LAW GROUP P A

3670 Maguire Blvd Ste 200

Orlando, FL 32803

Petitioner Attorney

MARIO ANTONIO PEREZ

Attorney at SHAPIRO FISHMAN AND GACHE

4630 Woodland Corp Blvd Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33614

Defendant Attorneys

LIOR SEGAL

13575 58Th St No Suite 140

Clearwater, FL 33760

FRANCIS MATTHEW KING

Attorney at KING HUDSON PLLC

360 Central Ave Ste 803

St Petersburg, FL 33701

LEE SEGAL, ESQ

Attorney at SEGAL AND SCHUH LAW GROUP P L

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

AP-CLK CERT-SERVICE CHARGE RECORD

08/17/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK RE NON PAYMENT

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

06/06/2016: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND OR COSTS

05/25/2016: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND-OR COSTS

EXHIBIT

05/29/2015: EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT

02/03/2015: AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT

12/09/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

12/09/2014: EXHIBIT

RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL. MAGISTRATE

11/25/2014: RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL. MAGISTRATE

CERTIFICATE

08/04/2014: CERTIFICATE

ORDER APPROVING REPORT RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL M

07/29/2014: ORDER APPROVING REPORT RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

RESPONSE

03/10/2014: RESPONSE

ORDER GRANTING

02/03/2014: ORDER GRANTING

AMENDED

09/02/2011: AMENDED

PLTF PET'S MOTION

08/26/2010: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/14/2010: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEF RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

04/06/2009: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER OF

02/13/2009: ANSWER OF

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

02/06/2009: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • DCA ORDER; Doc # 2; PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • APPEAL CLERK'S WORKSHEET WITH ATTACHMENT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DCA ORDER INITIAL BRIEF DUE; Doc # 1; 10/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PREPARED RECORD TO DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL; 2D17-1897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Receipt Apl Record $; 252.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF CLERK RE NON PAYMENT; RECORD PREPARATION FEES 2D17-1897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • ORIGINAL RECORD ON APPEAL PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • LETTER FROM 2ND DCA RE ASSIGN APPEAL NO. 2D17-1897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DCA ORDER; APPELLANT ATTORNEY SHALL FORWARD FILING FEES OR INSOLVENCY BY MAY 31 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • LETTER FROM CLERK RE APPEAL NOTICE TO DCA

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2017-09422; MCCASKILL, TED H; (252.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 252.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-13090; CHRISTIANA TRUST; (106.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 106.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-38817; CHRISTIANA TRUST; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-18316; CHRISTIANA TRUST; (18.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-29979; ANAS A IQBAL; (9.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; CHRISTIANA TRUST; Total Financial Assessment; 435.50; Total Payments and Credits; 435.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less