This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 11:15:19 (UTC).

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISON OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND , et al vs. FREDERIC BURNS, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2009 CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISON OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FREDERIC BURNS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

PINELLAS MORTGAGE SERVICES INC DOING BUSINESS AS PINELLAS MORTGAGE INC

TAYLOR BEAN AND WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND AS TRUSTEE FOR STANWICH

CHRISTIANA TRUST A DIVISION OF WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND AS TRUSTEE FOR STANWICH MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST SERIES 2013-1

Defendants and Plaintiffs

PINELLAS MORTGAGE SERVICES INC DOING BUSINESS AS PINELLAS MORTGAGE INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTOPHER JONES

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

BURKE KEN HONORABLE

BURNS, FREDERIC ALSO KNOWN AS BURNS, FREDERIC A

St Petersburg, FL 33702

DAMRON, JAMES M

Largo, FL 33777

DAMRON, JANET M

Largo, FL 33777

ELIAS, MARGARITA

JONES, CHRISTOPHER

St Petersburg, FL 33702

LAKES UNIT 2 PHASE 2 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PINELLAS COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION

PINELLAS MORTGAGE INC

UNKNOWN HEIRS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF FREDERIC BURNS ALSO KNOWN AS BURNS, FREDERIC A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GRACE S SANTOS

Attorney at DANIEL C. CONSUEGRA, PLLC

9204 King Palm Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

ANTHONY J SOLOMON

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC

201 E Pine St Ste 730

Orlando, FL 32801

NICOLE ROTHSTEIN

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL SERVICES LLC

201 E Pine St Ste 730

Orlando, FL 32801

TRENTON LEIGH

Attorney at LAWYER ASAP LLP

150 N Orange Ave Ste 100

Orlando, FL 32801

DANIEL J GRIECO, II

Attorney at DANIEL J GRIECO P A

8240 118 Ave N Ste 300

Largo, FL 33773

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/22/2014: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/22/2014: (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE

10/06/2014: NOTICE

EXHIBIT

08/20/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/20/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/20/2014: EXHIBIT

PLTF PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

08/20/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION SUBSTITUTING PARTY

EXHIBIT

08/15/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/15/2014: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

08/15/2014: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING

08/15/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/15/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DROPPING

08/15/2014: NOTICE OF DROPPING

NOTICE

01/31/2014: NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/20/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PLTF PET'S MOTION

10/22/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2015
  • ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • ORDER RELEASE ORIG DOC(S) FROM COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • PLTF-PET'S MOTION; TO RETURN ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • NOTICE; CHANGE OF LEAD ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2009
  • Additional Party Fee Paid $; Comment: ADDITIONAL PARTY FEE PAID - $22.50; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $; Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $21.00; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • Circuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $300.00; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; Comment: SUMMONS TO PROCESS SERVER; VER: N; K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; Comment: NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; Comment: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR16498PG2602-003; VER: F; P; Vol./Book 16498, Page 2602, 003 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: COMPLAINT; VER: F; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 011 BY 8306 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less