This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/18/2018 at 18:04:49 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK vs. NURIA L JIMENEZ, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2009 BANK OF NEW YORK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NURIA L JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANK OF NEW YORK

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR CE

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS CWALT INC ALTERNATE LOAN TRUST ETC

Defendants

DOE, JOHN

Dunedin, FL 34698

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GINA M IANNUCCI

Dunedin, FL 34698

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NURIA L JIMENEZ

Dunedin, FL 34698

AMBERLEA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1622 Dale Circle N

Dunedin, FL 34698

CARIBBEN POOL SERVICE INC

1324 Seven Springs Blvd #170

New Port Richey, FL 34655

IANNUCCI, GINA M ALSO KNOWN AS IANNUCCI, GINA

Dunedin, FL 34698

JIMENEZ, NELY

Dunedin, FL 34698

JIMENEZ, NURIA L

Dunedin, FL 34698

WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

1051 Northwest 14 Street

Miami, FL 33136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VILMA JANUSYTE

400 Northridge Rd Suite 1100 M/S 27

Sandy Springs, GA 30350

JUNE L JAMES

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

3575 Piedmont Rd Ne

Atlanta, GA 30305

ADAM A DIAZ

Attorney at SHD LEGAL GROUP P A

499 Nw 70Th Ave Ste 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33317

KATHLEEN E ANGIONE

Attorney at KAHANE & ASSOCIATES PA

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/14/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/14/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/14/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/07/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/07/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/07/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/07/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/07/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

09/09/2014: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

05/02/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SALE

04/10/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

01/13/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT

01/13/2014: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

01/13/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2014: AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE

11/07/2013: CERTIFICATE

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

10/28/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/02/2014: WRIT OF POSSESSION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF FORFEITURE OF UNCLAIMED MONEY UNDER F.S.116.21; 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION; ISSUED TO ATTY 10/3/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18402, Page 41, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-39707; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; (50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-27951; JOHNSON & FREEDMAN; (872.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 872.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-04347; MARIA KOMHLAN; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-04323; MARIA KOMHLAN; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON; Total Financial Assessment; 1,041.20; Total Payments and Credits; 1,041.20; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DEFENDANT; JIMENEZ, NURIA L; Total Financial Assessment; 100.00; Total Payments and Credits; 100.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less