Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/20/2018 at 00:53:22 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEIFICARIES ETC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2009 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEIFICARIES ETC. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

BANK OF AMERICA NA AS SUCCESSOR TO BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

Defendants

DOE, JANE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA L THOMPSON

THOMPSON, BARBARA L

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

BANK OF AMERICA N A

THOMPSON, BRIAN

Seminole, FL 33772

THOMPSON, SCOTT

Seminole, FL 33772

THOMPSON, SEAN

Seminole, FL 33772

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES ETC ESTATE OF THOMPSON, BARBARA L, DECEASED ALSO KNOWN AS THOMPSON,

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES ETC ESTATE OF THOMPSON, BARBARA L, DECEASED ALSO KNOWN AS THOMPSON, BARBARA LOUISE, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUZETTE MAYLOR

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

TRACY WEBSTER

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

JESSE ADAMS

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Suite 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendant Attorneys

Eric L Bolves

2110 E Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32801

MICHAEL LEON EISENBAND

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

500 E Broward Blvd Ste 2100

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

05/08/2014: CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

AFFIDAVIT

08/01/2014: AFFIDAVIT

MOTION

08/01/2014: MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/01/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

04/22/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SALE

04/17/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

02/14/2014: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

EXHIBIT

02/10/2014: E-FILED LOAN DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF FILING

02/10/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

02/10/2014: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

02/06/2014: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

ATTACHMENT

12/23/2013: ATTACHMENT

SUMMONS AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/05/2013: SUMMONS-AMEND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT SERVED

FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

12/03/2013: FORECLOSURE CASE STATUS FORM

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/02/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/02/2013: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION

07/22/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/21/2014: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • MOTION; FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURCHASER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT; OF COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTING TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • EXHIBIT; A LETTER AS TO NOTC TO VACATE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 060214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • ORDER VACATING; /SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT; Vol./Book 18448, Page 197, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-04388; Aldridge Connors; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-04372; Aldridge Connors; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-10599; ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP; (1,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-80572; BANK OF AMERICA N A; (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CVCLW-2013-00882; ALDRIDGE CONNORS LLP; (22.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,201.50; Total Payments and Credits; 1,201.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 22.50

    Read MoreRead Less