Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 18:54:43 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA vs. MARK LEVY, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2009 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARK LEVY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ST. JOHN, SUSAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ST. JOHN, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FORMERLY KNOWN AS COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING

BANK OF AMERICA NA

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FORMERLY KNOWN AS COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

TENANT 1

TENANT 2

TENANT 3

TENANT 4

LEVY, LORITA V

St Petersburg, FL 33712

LEVY, MARK

St Petersburg, FL 33712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LORIANN WOOTTEN

Attorney at BUTLER AND HOSCH P A

3185 S Conway Rd Suite E

Orlando, FL 32812-7315

ALLISON R SEBASTIAN

Attorney at RONALD R WOLFE AND ASSOCIATES

25018

Tampa, FL 33622

Defendant Attorneys

D RAND PEACOCK, JR

Po Box 48637

St Petersburg, FL 33743-8637

D RAND PEACOCK JR, ESQ

Attorney at RAND PEACOCK P A

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 900H

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CLERK CORRESPONDENCE

07/25/2014: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE

CONSENT

07/17/2014: CONSENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/17/2014: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

WITNESS LIST

06/12/2014: WITNESS LIST

EXHIBIT

06/12/2014: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF FILING

06/12/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

OBJECTION

06/05/2014: OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/05/2014: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE

04/21/2014: NOTICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION

10/02/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

08/22/2013: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/07/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/07/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

07/19/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/01/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION

04/05/2013: STIPULATION

NOTICE

08/01/2014: NOTICE OF SALE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18626, Page 2066, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; ADDITIONAL 1000.00 FILING FEE/PD 8/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT - BACKLOG PROJECT (SRS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Vol./Book 18475, Page 1232, 6 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 013 BY 4905 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # CV-2014-62150; BUTLER & HOSCH; (0.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-11516; Sade Donald; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2014-11381; Sade Donald; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2014-45414; BUTLER AND HOSCH PA; (1,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • PLAINTIFF; BANK OF AMERICA NA; Total Financial Assessment; 1,119.70; Total Payments and Credits; 1,119.70; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D RAND PEACOCK, JR