Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/19/2018 at 21:28:26 (UTC).

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P vs. PAMELA L DELACRUZ, et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2009 BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAMELA L DELACRUZ. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT S

CHASE BANK USA N A

DELACRUZ OSWALD

St Petersburg, FL 33703

DELACRUZ, PAMELA L

St Petersburg, FL 33703

SYCAMORE ESTATES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

7601 Ml King St N Ste B

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Assignee

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JULISSA DIAZ

Attorney at FRENKEL LAMBERT WEISS ONE E BROWARD BLVD STE

1430

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

ADAM E WILLIS

Attorney at SHD LEGAL GROUP P A

499 Nw 70Th Avenue Suite 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33317

INGRID GRACE FADIL

Attorney at KAHANE AND ASSOCIATES

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

C BYRON STOUT, III

Attorney at C BYRON STOUT III P A

7601 38 Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33710

UTA S GROVE

Attorney at GROVE AND CINTON

2600 E Bay Dr Ste 220

Largo, FL 33771

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

09/17/2015: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF SALE

08/18/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE

07/15/2015: NOTICE

ATTACHMENT

04/03/2015: ATTACHMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

04/03/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

RESPONSE

02/12/2015: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

02/12/2015: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

12/22/2014: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO AMEND

WITNESS LIST

12/19/2014: WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/03/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/03/2014: CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF FILING

03/27/2014: NOTICE OF FILING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/27/2014: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

03/26/2014: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF

PLTF PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

11/19/2013: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/06/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION

05/15/2013: MOTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/08/2013: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 18950, Page 671, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE; CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; INTEREST AND PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • EXHIBIT; A COPY PUB AFFIDAVIT AND INVOICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • NOTICE; OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSIGNMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND FORECLOSURE SALE BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2009
  • THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION; Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 011 BY 7353 - RANDOM MF; VER: N; P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2015-12602; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; (474.60)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 474.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-07921; COLLINS MALLARD; (49.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2015-07919; COLLINS MALLARD; (70.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2013-58451; GROVE LAW OFFICE; (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • PLAINTIFF; BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING L P; Total Financial Assessment; 594.60; Total Payments and Credits; 594.60; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less