This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/27/2023 at 23:30:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER T

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER T. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SZEMATOWICZ, BRETT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6-MM

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SZEMATOWICZ, BRETT

 

Party Details

Defendant

THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER T

Tampa, FL 33614

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

NATHANIA BELTRAN VOSLER

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

17500

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR MANDATORY RELEASE

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR MANDATORY RELEASE

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

11/15/2022: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

11/15/2022: PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED

12/12/2022: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CRIME VICTIM INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

12/12/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CRIME VICTIM INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

PLEA / ADMISSION FORM

01/09/2023: CHANGE OF PLEA FOR VOP

JUDGMENT & SENTENCE

01/09/2023: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE (R)

COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

01/09/2023: COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS

01/13/2023: JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS

NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

01/13/2023: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED

JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

01/13/2023: JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

01/13/2023: JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

CRIM_CLK_Notice337771854

01/05/2023: NOTICE

CR HEARING NOTICE - DEFENDANT

01/23/2023: NOTICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCANCELED; ARRAIGNMENT; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SZEMATOWICZ, BRETT); PLEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE Doc # 32; SENT TO DEFT ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMULTIPLE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT Doc # 28; SEE MAIN CASE: 12-12065MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; Doc # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketPLEA / ADMISSION FORM; Doc # 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER T; Total Financial Assessment; 617.08; Total Payments and Credits; 17.08; Balance Due 600.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER T; Total Financial Assessment; 617.08; Total Payments and Credits; 17.08; Balance Due 600.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CRIME VICTIM INFO WITHIN COURT FILING; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketADVISORY - MALE, MISDEMEANOR; (8:15 AM) (Judicial Officer LEVINE, PAUL A); SPN/PersonID: 311987789 Case Number: 22-15376-MM Name: THOMAS-JONES, XAVIER Booking Number: SO1913356; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketADV HRG - BOND AMENDED Doc # 1; $4000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS TEXT - ICD Doc # 2; BOND AMENDED $1500.00 - CHARGE 01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS TEXT - ICD Doc # 3; BOND AMENDED $2500.00 - CHARGE 02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 4; Charges:; 1; PETIT THEFT (8120143B); 2; TRESPASS IN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE (810082A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 6; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM Doc # 7; 7-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED Doc # 8; Charges:; 1; PETIT THEFT (8120143B); 2; TRESPASS IN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE (810082A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATHANIA BELTRAN VOSLER