This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/27/2023 at 23:30:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. POWELL, JOSEPH EDWARD, JR

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against POWELL, JOSEPH EDWARD, JR. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCKYTON, CATHY A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3-MM

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCKYTON, CATHY A

 

Party Details

Defendant

POWELL, JOSEPH EDWARD, JR

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lei Lei

Attorney at Attn: PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE

14250 49Th St N

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

11/14/2022: INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

12/06/2022: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

CRIM_CLK_Notice337084383

11/17/2022: NOTICE

ORDER TO ISSUE CAPIAS & BOND SET

12/05/2022: ORDER TO ISSUE CAPIAS & BOND SET

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

01/15/2023: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

01/15/2023: PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CASH BOND POSTED

01/20/2023: CASH BOND POSTED

CRIM_CLK_Notice338020715

01/20/2023: NOTICE

CRIM_CLK_Notice338020715

01/23/2023: NOTICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer MCKYTON, CATHY A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 12; REF:37461563; Charges:; 4; FAILURE TO COMPLY (32772)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 13; REF:37431563; Charges:; 1; FAILURE TO COMPLY (32772)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 14; REF: 37431563; Charges:; 6; FAILURE TO COMPLY (32772)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 15; REF:37431563 PAID $461.00 REF: 37431584 PAID $52.00; Charges:; 2; FAILURE TO COMPLY (32772)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 16; REF: 37431584; Charges:; 3; FAILURE TO COMPLY (32772)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASH BOND POSTED; Doc # 17; REF:37431584; Charges:; 5; FAILURE TO COMPLY (379401)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketADVISORY - MALE, MISDEMEANOR; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SZEMATOWICZ, BRETT); SPN/PersonID: 311003815 Case Number: 22-15373-MM Name: POWELL, JOSEPH Booking Number: SO1918635; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 9; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • DocketWARRANT SERVED Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT; Doc # 5; 1_9214890194038396110255_202211_22-15373-MM.pdf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SUMMONS; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer MCKYTON, CATHY A); Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketORDER TO ISSUE CAPIAS & BOND SET; Doc # 2; $3078.00/FTA $513.00 per each count

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCAPIAS CONDITIONS Doc # 3; NO BOND REDUCTION NO ROR PER COURT ROR OR REDUCTION ONLY ALLOWED BY DIVISION JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR Doc # 4; FOR ARRAIGNMENT SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 1; 6 COUNTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lei Lei