This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/27/2023 at 23:31:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HENDERSHOTT, DYLAN MARVIN

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HENDERSHOTT, DYLAN MARVIN. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARBALLO, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-MO

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARBALLO, JOHN

 

Party Details

Defendant

HENDERSHOTT, DYLAN MARVIN

Largo, FL 33770

Not Classified By Court

BONDSMAN ON 49TH STREET

13584 49Th St N #1

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN G DEBERG, ESQ

Attorney at DEBERG & DEBERG P A

1915 Tyrone Blvd

St Petersburg, FL 33710

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND POSTED

11/23/2022: SURETY BOND POSTED

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

11/15/2022: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

INFORMATION FILED

12/20/2022: INFORMATION FILED

ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

01/10/2023: ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR COSTS OF PROSECUTION

01/10/2023: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR COSTS OF PROSECUTION

CRIM_CLK_Notice337614131

12/21/2022: NOTICE

CRIM_CLK_Notice337614131

12/21/2022: NOTICE

CRIM_CLK_Notice337614131

12/21/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer ZUROWESTE, ELIZABETH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST FOR COSTS OF PROSECUTION; Doc # 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialORDINANCE FILING FEE; CLEARWATER POLICE - ORD FILING FEE; Total Financial Assessment; 10.00; Total Payments and Credits; 10.00; Balance Due 0.00; Draw Down Account; Receipt # CJ-2022-57509; CLEARWATER POLICE - ORD FILING FEE; (10.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSURETY BOND POSTED; Doc # 12; Charges:; 1; POSSESSION OF OPEN CONTAINER OF ALCOHOL (U40)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketADVISORY - FELONY RETURN; (9:10 AM) (Judicial Officer ST. JOHN, SUSAN); 11/22/2022; 11/22/2022; Reset by Court to 11/22/2022; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY BY ATTORNEY Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDEMAND AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; BENJAMIN DEBERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialORDINANCE FILING FEE; CLEARWATER POLICE - ORD FILING FEE; Total Financial Assessment; 10.00; Total Payments and Credits; 10.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketADVISORY - MALE, FELONY; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer MATTHEY, PHILIPPE); SPN/PersonID: 311345714 Case Number: 22-15382-MO Name: HENDERSHOTT, DYLAN Booking Number: SO1913369; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketFELONY ADVISORY RETURN Doc # 4; 11/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONDSMAN ON 49TH STREET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN G DEBERG, ESQ