This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:07:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TITA, TABITHA MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TITA, TABITHA MARIE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FARNELL, DEE ANNA. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-CF

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FARNELL, DEE ANNA

 

Party Details

Defendant

TITA, TABITHA MARIE

Clearwater, FL 33764

Not Classified By Court

BONDSMAN ON 49TH STREET

13620 49Th St N Ste 33

Clearwater, FL 33762

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KATHARINE SELLERS

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5028

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

02/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

WAIVED RIGHT TO SPEEDY TRIAL

06/24/2019: WAIVED RIGHT TO SPEEDY TRIAL

CRIM_CLK_Notice315980894

04/26/2019: NOTICE

CRIM_CLK_Notice315150678

03/12/2019: NOTICE

TRANSFER TO OR RE-ASSIGN TO DIVISION

02/21/2019: TRANSFER TO OR RE-ASSIGN TO DIVISION

NOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT

10/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT

CONSENT FOR DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

03/11/2019: CONSENT FOR DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE TO BOND AGENCY

06/19/2019: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE TO BOND AGENCY

SURETY BOND POSTED

01/11/2019: SURETY BOND POSTED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer FARNELL, DEE ANNA); JUDICIAL REVIEW / PTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMOTION; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer FARNELL, DEE ANNA); JUDICIAL REVIEW/PTI; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDRUG COURT JUDICIAL STATUS REVIEW; Doc # 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET; Doc # 38; JUDICIAL REVIEW / PTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDRUG COURT PROGRAM DOCUMENTS; Doc # 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT; Doc # 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CHECK/CONFERENCE; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer FARNELL, DEE ANNA); JUDICIAL REVIEW / PTI; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketDRUG COURT JUDICIAL STATUS REVIEW; Doc # 33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET; Doc # 34; JUDICIAL REVIEW/PTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT; Doc # 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketTRANSFER TO OR RE-ASSIGN TO DIVISION; Doc # 11; N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 6; 2 COUNTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND POSTED; Doc # 4; Charges: 2; POSSESSION OF THC OIL (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND POSTED; Doc # 5; Charges: 1; POSSESSION OF COCAINE (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - FEMALE, FELONY; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer ANDREWS, MICHAEL F); SPN/PersonID: 1233006 Case Number: 19-00342-CF Name: TITA, TABITH Booking Number: SO1786184; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2; Charges: 1; POSSESSION OF COCAINE (893136A); 2; POSSESSION OF THC OIL (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 3; Charges: 2; POSSESSION OF THC OIL (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BONDSMAN ON 49TH STREET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATHARINE SELLERS