This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:35:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FARNELL, DEE ANNA. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6-CF

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FARNELL, DEE ANNA

 

Party Details

Defendant

THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

NICK OF TIME BAIL BONDS

14835 49Th St N

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SAMANTHA SEALEY

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5028

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

CS JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND COSTS

07/31/2019: CRIMINAL

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY

03/26/2019: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY

CRIM_CLK_Notice315150673

03/12/2019: NOTICE

ORDER OF PROBATION / COMMUNITY CONTROL

07/30/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION / COMMUNITY CONTROL

DEMAND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/05/2019: DEMAND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

AFFIDAVIT OF VOP

09/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF VOP

WAIVED RIGHT TO SPEEDY TRIAL

06/24/2019: WAIVED RIGHT TO SPEEDY TRIAL

WARRANT

09/13/2019: WARRANT

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

07/16/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CHECK/CONFERENCE; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer FARNELL, DEE ANNA); JUDICIAL REVIEW / PROBATION; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketOUTSTANDING WARRANT REMAINS; Doc # 87

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR; Doc # 88; FOR STATUS CHECK/CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketWARRANT; Doc # 85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF VOP; Doc # 86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 83; Vol./Book 20644, Page 1490, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 84; Vol./Book 20647, Page 579, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE; Total Financial Assessment; 925.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 925.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE; Total Financial Assessment; 925.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 925.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; THORSEN, ALICIA RENEE; Total Financial Assessment; 925.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 925.00; Transaction Assessment; 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketBOND HEARING - NO CHANGE; Doc # 14; Charges: 3; POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA (8931471B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 8; $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - FEMALE, FELONY; (8:35 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H); SPN/PersonID: 2739141 Case Number: 19-00426-CF Name: THORSEN, ALICIA Booking Number: SO1786404; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 2; Charges: 1; POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (893136A); 2; POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (893136A); 3; POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA (8931471B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 4; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 6; Charges: 1; POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICK OF TIME BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMANTHA SEALEY