This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 19:40:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SANTANA-DIAZ, JOEL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SANTANA-DIAZ, JOEL. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********C-CF

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

SANTANA-DIAZ, JOEL

Pinellas Park, FL 33782

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO ACCEPT PLEA FOR SENTENCING IN ABSENTIA

01/26/2021: PETITION TO ACCEPT PLEA FOR SENTENCING IN ABSENTIA

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

01/21/2021: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

01/21/2021: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

CRIM_CLK_Notice326202403

01/25/2021: NOTICE

CRIM_CLK_Notice326075516

01/15/2021: NOTICE

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

01/15/2021: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

12/28/2020: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketBOND; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer BULONE, JOSEPH A); BOND REDUCTION; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING - IN COURT; Doc # 14; D/MTN FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketBOND AMENDED TO ROR; Doc # 15; (UNSUPERVISED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 13; OF PLEA IN ABSENTIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO ACCEPT PLEA FOR SENTENCING IN ABSENTIA; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBOND; (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer BULONE, JOSEPH A); COP VIDEO; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBOND REDUCTION HEARING SET; Doc # 8; BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF MOTION FORWARDED TO COURT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketADVISORY - MALE, FELONY; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer HELINGER, CHRIS); SPN/PersonID: 3035173 Case Number: 20-04870-OC-CF Name: SANTANA DIAZ, JOEL Booking Number: SO1852448; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSENT COMPLAINT & ARREST AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 5; PASCO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less