This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2020 at 05:36:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JUDD, BRITTANY ANN

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JUDD, BRITTANY ANN. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEY, NANCY MOATE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2-CF

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEY, NANCY MOATE

 

Party Details

Defendant

JUDD, BRITTANY ANN

Ocala, FL 34482-1479

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ELIZABETH ZUROWESTE

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5028

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

02/21/2019: JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

01/03/2019: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

01/03/2019: PD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

01/07/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

ADMINISTRATIVE COUNT CLOSURE

01/24/2019: ADMINISTRATIVE COUNT CLOSURE

INFORMATION FILED

01/24/2019: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

01/30/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/05/2019: ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

DEMAND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

02/05/2019: DEMAND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO CLAIM ALIBI

SENTENCED UNDER GUIDELINES

02/11/2019: SENTENCED UNDER GUIDELINES

COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

02/13/2019: COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

PLEA / ADMISSION FORM

02/13/2019: PLEA / ADMISSION FORM

MTN & ORD FORWARDED FOR NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF D

02/13/2019: MTN & ORD FORWARDED FOR NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF DL TO DHSMV

COURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV

02/18/2019: COURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV

CRIM_CLK_Notice314341541

01/28/2019: NOTICE

CS JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND COSTS

02/15/2019: CRIMINAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECEIVED BY LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR; Doc # 38; Party: JUDD, BRITTANY ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JUDD, BRITTANY ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 1,250.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,250.00; Transaction Assessment; 250.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2019
  • DocketREFERRED TO COLLECTION AGENCY; Doc # 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 36; Vol./Book 20441, Page 272, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 35; Vol./Book 20437, Page 1302, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; ARRAIGNMENT; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer LEY, NANCY MOATE); ORDER FROM COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV; Doc # 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JUDD, BRITTANY ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 1,250.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,250.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JUDD, BRITTANY ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 1,250.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,250.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JUDD, BRITTANY ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 1,250.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,250.00; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JUDD, BRITTANY ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 1,250.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,250.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 8; $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - FEMALE, FELONY; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer LEY, NANCY MOATE); SPN/PersonID: 1637404 Case Number: 19-00082-CF Name: JUDD, BRITTANY Booking Number: SO1785422; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 4; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 6; Charges: 2; POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH ZUROWESTE