This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/04/2021 at 23:32:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, ADRIAN JAMES DIONDRAE

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, ADRIAN JAMES DIONDRAE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VACCARO, DOROTHY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7-MM

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

VACCARO, DOROTHY

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOHNSON, ADRIAN JAMES DIONDRAE

St Petersburg, FL 33733

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

 

Court Documents

CRIM_CLK_Notice323254207

07/14/2020: NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

05/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

CRIM_CLK_Notice324125689

09/09/2020: NOTICE

NOLLE PROSSED

10/26/2020: NOLLE PROSSED

CRIM_CLK_Notice323454366

07/29/2020: NOTICE

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY

09/03/2020: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY

ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/10/2020: ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR COSTS OF PROSECUTION

06/09/2020: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR COSTS OF PROSECUTION

CRIM_CLK_Notice321921249

04/07/2020: NOTICE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JOHNSON, ADRIAN JAMES DIONDRAE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; NOLLE PROSSED - NO INFORMATION FILED; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOLLE PROSSED; Doc # 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY; Doc # 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY); Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CHECK/CONFERENCE; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY); COMPETENCY; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketFOUND COMPETENT; Doc # 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketWAIVED RIGHT TO SPEEDY TRIAL; Doc # 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL HEARING SET; Doc # 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SUMMONS; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer VACCARO, DOROTHY); 04/20/2020; Reset by Court to 06/01/2020; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL HEARING SET; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; JOHNSON, ADRIAN JAMES DIONDRAE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less