This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2020 at 05:39:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BROWN, DAMIEN J

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN, DAMIEN J. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEY, NANCY MOATE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0-CF

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEY, NANCY MOATE

 

Party Details

Defendant

BROWN, DAMIEN J

Clearwater, FL 33755

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

NICK OF TIME BAIL BONDS

14835 49Th St N

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ELIZABETH ZUROWESTE

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5028

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/08/2019: ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

CRIM_CLK_Notice315474815

03/29/2019: NOTICE

JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

05/22/2019: JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

SURETY BOND POSTED

01/04/2019: SURETY BOND POSTED

NOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT

04/29/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING GENERATED IN COURT

COMPLAINT

01/03/2019: COMPLAINT

CRIM_CLK_Notice315474815

03/29/2019: NOTICE

PLEA / ADMISSION FORM

05/17/2019: PLEA / ADMISSION FORM

CRIM_CLK_Notice314980238

03/04/2019: NOTICE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECEIVED BY LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR; Doc # 40; Party: BROWN, DAMIEN J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BROWN, DAMIEN J; Total Financial Assessment; 1,234.28; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,234.28; Transaction Assessment; 246.86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketREFERRED TO COLLECTION AGENCY; Doc # 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE RETURNED UNCLAIMED/UNDELIVERABLE; Doc # 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 37; Vol./Book 20557, Page 2346, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE TO BOND AGENCY; Doc # 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 33; Vol./Book 20554, Page 947, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV; Doc # 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BROWN, DAMIEN J; Total Financial Assessment; 1,234.28; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,234.28; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BROWN, DAMIEN J; Total Financial Assessment; 1,234.28; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,234.28; Transaction Assessment; 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 7; $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 9; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT PLEA - NOT GUILTY; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL HEARING SET; Doc # 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND POSTED; Doc # 4; Charges: 1; POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (893136A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - MALE, FELONY; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer LEY, NANCY MOATE); SPN/PersonID: 3053978 Case Number: 19-00060-CF Name: BROWN, DAMIAN Booking Number: SO1785365; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICK OF TIME BAIL BONDS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH ZUROWESTE