This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:37:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Justice Center - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HELINGER, CHRIS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8-CF

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HELINGER, CHRIS

 

Party Details

Defendant

BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE

Clearwater, FL 33758

Not Classified By Court

STATE OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KATRINA FEYERABEND

Attorney at STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

5028

Clearwater, FL 33758

 

Court Documents

SENTENCED UNDER GUIDELINES

02/19/2019: SENTENCED UNDER GUIDELINES

COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

01/13/2019: COMPLAINT & ADVISORY

JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

02/25/2019: JUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS

COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

02/19/2019: COMMITMENT TO SHERIFF

COURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV

02/25/2019: COURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV

JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS

02/25/2019: JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS

NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

02/07/2019: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED

CRIM_CLK_Notice314491351

02/05/2019: NOTICE

INFORMATION FILED

01/31/2019: INFORMATION FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS RECEIVED BY PENN; Doc # 39; Party: BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 1,156.25; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,156.25; Transaction Assessment; 231.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketREFERRED TO COLLECTION AGENCY; Doc # 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCANCELED; ARRAIGNMENT; (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer HELINGER, CHRIS); PLEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED REPORT OF DISPOSITION TO DMV; Doc # 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 36; Vol./Book 20443, Page 1793, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR FINE AND/OR COSTS; Doc # 37; Vol./Book 20444, Page 170, 1 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 1,156.25; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,156.25; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 1,156.25; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,156.25; Transaction Assessment; 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; BITINAITIS, LYNN MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 1,156.25; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 1,156.25; Transaction Assessment; 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketDETERMINATION OF STATUS - INDIGENT; Doc # 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketINDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE FEE ASSESSED; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - FELONY RETURN; (8:35 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H); 1/13/2019; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & ADVISORY; Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketORDER OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND; Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketPD APPOINTED WRITTEN PLEA NG BY PD & DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; Doc # 5; PROVISIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketADV HRG - NO CHANGE IN BOND; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2019
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE COSTS REQUESTED; Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketADVISORY - FEMALE, FELONY; (8:35 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H); SPN/PersonID: 220704 Case Number: 19-00428-CF Name: BITINATTIS, LYNN Booking Number: SO1786415; Result: HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • DocketFELONY ADVISORY RETURN; Doc # 2; 1/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feyerabend, Katrina