Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 15:50:08 (UTC).

ZUBEE, ROBERT JR VS ZUBEE, TATUM

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 ZUBEE, ROBERT JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZUBEE, TATUM. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WESTINE, LAURALEE GANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUBEE, ROBERT JR

Defendant

ZUBEE, TATUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANTARAS, KONSTANTINOS DEAN

Defendant Attorney

ELLZEY, HOWARD HUNTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Response To Request Production FILED BY ROBERT ZUBEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Financial Affidavit ROBERT ZUBEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Certificate Of Compliance FILED BY ROBERT ZUBEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice of Filing FILED BY ROBERT ZUBEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Answer TO WIFES COUNTERPETTION FILED BY ROBERT ZUBEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Certificate Of Compliance FILED BY TATUM ZUBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Filing ; DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Financial Affidavit ; DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PETITIOJNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Demand FOR COMPLIANCEW/MADATORY DISCLOSURE FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To TO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018DR006015DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Designating Email Address ; FILED BY K DEAN KANTARAS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer K DEAN KANTARAS, ESQ