This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/26/2019 at 08:31:27 (UTC).

ZANIOS, CHRIS JAMES VS KITZLER, RANDALL ALAN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 ZANIOS, CHRIS JAMES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KITZLER, RANDALL ALAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZANIOS, CHRIS JAMES

Defendant

KITZLER, RANDALL ALAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

02/19/2019:Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

Summons Issued And Returned To PLF, RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

02/19/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PLF, RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served POSTED 031219 RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Default Entered AGAINST RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Summons Returned Served 021919 RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Motion For Default On RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Motion For Default On (COURT) RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Case 512019CC000706CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLF, RANDALL ALAN KITZLER

    Read MoreRead Less