This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 06:49:15 (UTC).

WYLLIE, CYNTHIA G, WYLLIE, ELIZABETH LOUISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 WYLLIE, CYNTHIA G, WYLLIE, ELIZABETH LOUISE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

WYLLIE, CYNTHIA G

Decedent

WYLLIE, ELIZABETH LOUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

BOMHOFF, PHILIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBond of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR FML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO THE CLERK DATED MAY 11, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY Death Certificate - Frederick Ledbetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000775CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOMHOFF, PHILIP