This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:27:03 (UTC).

WINDTREE APARTMENTS VS GREEN, KIALENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 WINDTREE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GREEN, KIALENE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINDTREE APARTMENTS

Defendants

GREEN, KIALENE

PEAVY, MATHEW

ROCHA, SIERRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 011019 MATHEW PEAVY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Default Entered MATHEW PEAVY, SIERRA ROCHA, KIALENE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served SIERRA ROCHA 121718 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served MATHEW PEAVY 121718 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served KIALENE GREEN 121718 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR KIALENE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR SIERRA ROCHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR MATHEW PEAVY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF ALL DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case 512018CC004901CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.