This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/21/2019 at 08:32:02 (UTC).

WINDTREE APARTMENTS VS GRAVEN, ATIKA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 WINDTREE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GRAVEN, ATIKA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINDTREE APARTMENTS

Defendants

GRAVEN, ATIKA

HOUT, JOHNATHAN

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Summons Served ATIKA GRAVEN 021819 (POSTED)

02/19/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served ATIKA GRAVEN 021819 (POSTED)

Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

02/14/2019:Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOHNATHAN HOUT AND ATIKA GRAVEN

02/14/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOHNATHAN HOUT AND ATIKA GRAVEN

Summons Issued And Returned To JOHNATHAN HOUT ISSD ELISOR

02/14/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To JOHNATHAN HOUT ISSD ELISOR

Summons Issued And Returned To ATIKA GRAVEN ISSD ELISOR

02/14/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To ATIKA GRAVEN ISSD ELISOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 030819 JOHNATHAN HOUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Default Entered ATIKA GRAVEN AND JOHNATHAN HOUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Motion For Default On JOHNATHAN HOUT AND ATIKA GRAVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ATIKA GRAVEN 021819 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served JONATHAN HOUT 021819 (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case 512019CC000667CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOHNATHAN HOUT AND ATIKA GRAVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To JOHNATHAN HOUT ISSD ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATIKA GRAVEN ISSD ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • File Verified To This Point EY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.