Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 08:31:58 (UTC).

WINDSOR CLUB GROUP LP VS BRETTELLE, JENNIFER Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 WINDSOR CLUB GROUP LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRETTELLE, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINDSOR CLUB GROUP LP

Defendants

BRETTELLE, JENNIFER

CARR, WINSTON

Not Classified By Court

WINDSOR CLUB GP LLC

GP PMC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWENHAUPT, KENNETH JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Default Judgment FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO SHERIFF (PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Default Entered AGAINST WINSTON CARR AND JENNIFER BRETTELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Motion For Default On ON WINSTON CARR AND JENNIFER BRETTELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Return of Service FOR DEFENDANT/ WINSTON CARR ON 041319 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Return of Service (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ JENNIFER BRETTELLE ON 041319 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ JENNIFER BRETTELLE ON 041319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served FOR DEFENDANT/ WINSTON CARR ON 041319 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; JENNIFER BRETTELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; WINSTON CARR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC001364CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNETH LOWENHAUPT