This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 06/10/2022 at 06:01:32 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS DISCOVER BANK Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DISCOVER BANK. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendants

JAMROZ, KATARZYNA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JA

VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI

WINDSOR PLACE AT RIVER RIDGE A

DISCOVER BANK

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETRINO, BRADFORD

Defendant Attorney

RUSSO, ADAM GARRETT

 

Court Documents

Default Entered ON DISCOVER BANK

06/09/2022:Default Entered ON DISCOVER BANK

Default for Entry by Clerk

06/08/2022:Default for Entry by Clerk

Motion For Default On DISCOVER BANK

06/08/2022:Motion For Default On DISCOVER BANK

Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

05/27/2022:Answer And Affirmative Defense DF

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY KATARZYNA JAMROZ

05/27/2022:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY KATARZYNA JAMROZ

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMIAL ADDRESS FILED BY ADAM G RUSSO ESQ OBO KATARZYNA JAMROZ

05/21/2022:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMIAL ADDRESS FILED BY ADAM G RUSSO ESQ OBO KATARZYNA JAMROZ

Notice of Dropping Party or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 and UNKNOWN TENANT #2,

05/20/2022:Notice of Dropping Party or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 and UNKNOWN TENANT #2,

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENNAT 1

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN TENNAT 1

Return of Service on Summons Served ON DISCOVER BANK 051722

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON DISCOVER BANK 051722

Return of Service on Summons Served ON WINDSOR PLACE AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC 051722

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON WINDSOR PLACE AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC 051722

Return of Service on Summons Served ON VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC 051722

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC 051722

Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Unserved ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ

Return of Service on Summons Served ON KATARZYNA JAMROZ 051822 NMA

05/20/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON KATARZYNA JAMROZ 051822 NMA

Answer FILED BY VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC

05/20/2022:Answer FILED BY VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCIATION INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, UNKNOWN TENANT 2

05/13/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, UNKNOWN TENANT 1

05/13/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, DISCOVER BANK

05/13/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, DISCOVER BANK

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered ON DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault for Entry by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Extension Of Time FILED BY KATARZYNA JAMROZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMIAL ADDRESS FILED BY ADAM G RUSSO ESQ OBO KATARZYNA JAMROZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 2 dismissed 5/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 1 dismissed 5/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketUNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ dismissed 5/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party or Parties UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATARZYNA JAMROZ; UNKNOWN TENANT #1 and UNKNOWN TENANT #2,

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm B Notice To Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNew Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Possession of Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA001230CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGES AT RIVER RIDGE ASSOCI is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADFORD PETRINO