Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/06/2019 at 08:31:37 (UTC).

WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A VS ABEAR, JOY M Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ABEAR, JOY M. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A

Defendants

GANNUSCIO, JOSEPH A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ABEAR JOY M

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

ABEAR, JOY M

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GANNUSCIO JO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURIEL, MELISA

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOY M ABEAR

08/06/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOY M ABEAR

Notice of Dropping Party or Parties UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2 AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

07/15/2019:Notice of Dropping Party or Parties UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2 AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

Default Entered AGAINST JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

06/14/2019:Default Entered AGAINST JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

Return of Service on Summons Served (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ JOY M ABEAR ON 073019

08/06/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ JOY M ABEAR ON 073019

Response FILED BY JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO AND JOY M ABEAR

08/07/2019:Response FILED BY JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO AND JOY M ABEAR

Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

06/14/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #2

06/05/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Default for Entry by Clerk FOR DEFENDANTS/ JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

06/14/2019:Default for Entry by Clerk FOR DEFENDANTS/ JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

Motion For Default On JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

06/14/2019:Motion For Default On JOSEPH A GANNUSCIO

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLTF

12/19/2019:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal FILED BY PLTF

Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens

12/19/2019:Notice of Discharge/Cancellation of Lis Pendens

Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

10/15/2019:Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment

08/23/2019:Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment

Notice of Dropping Party or Parties DEFENDANT/JOY M ABEAR

08/16/2019:Notice of Dropping Party or Parties DEFENDANT/JOY M ABEAR

Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

08/23/2019:Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 101519 AT 9AM

09/11/2019:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 101519 AT 9AM

Complaint (LIEN FORECLOSURE) W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

04/01/2019:Complaint (LIEN FORECLOSURE) W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

Notice Of Lis Pendens

04/01/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC001379CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint (LIEN FORECLOSURE) W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURIEL , MELISA