Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 07/11/2019 at 08:30:56 (UTC).

WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A VS 1, UNKNOWN TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 1, UNKNOWN TENANT. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A

Defendants

LOWES HOME CENTERS INC STORE 1

1, UNKNOWN TENANT

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRA

Not Classified By Court

PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURIEL, MELISA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

06/10/2020:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT /THE BANK OF NEW YORK

06/06/2019:Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT /THE BANK OF NEW YORK

Order TO BE DISCHARGED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTY AD LITEM

04/08/2020:Order TO BE DISCHARGED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTY AD LITEM

Motion To Cancel Sale FILED BY PLTF

06/11/2020:Motion To Cancel Sale FILED BY PLTF

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

06/10/2020:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate FILED BY PLTF

06/17/2020:Motion to Set Aside/Vacate FILED BY PLTF

Order To Vacate FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

06/29/2020:Order To Vacate FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

Payoff Statement

06/11/2020:Payoff Statement

Order Granting Motion To Cancel FORECLOSURE Sale SET FOR JUNE 24, 2020

06/12/2020:Order Granting Motion To Cancel FORECLOSURE Sale SET FOR JUNE 24, 2020

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing ON 042120 @10AM

04/01/2020:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing ON 042120 @10AM

Default Entered LAWRENCE WILLIAM GREENE

12/16/2019:Default Entered LAWRENCE WILLIAM GREENE

Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #1

07/25/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Notice Designating Email Address OBO DEFENDANTS

07/23/2019:Notice Designating Email Address OBO DEFENDANTS

Motion TO ADD PARTY DEFENDANT FILED BY PLTF

07/25/2019:Motion TO ADD PARTY DEFENDANT FILED BY PLTF

Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

03/24/2020:Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Notice of Filing ATTACHED AFFD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT, AFFD OF DAWN WEIGER ONEILL ESQ AND AFFD OF FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF

03/24/2020:Notice of Filing ATTACHED AFFD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT, AFFD OF DAWN WEIGER ONEILL ESQ AND AFFD OF FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF

Motion For Default On AGAINST THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

01/03/2020:Motion For Default On AGAINST THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Default for Entry by Clerk FILED BY PLTF

08/06/2019:Default for Entry by Clerk FILED BY PLTF

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Order APPOINTING ATTORNEY ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Motion to Appoint FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Death Certificate Copy FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT /UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT / LOWES HOME CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT /THE BANK OF NEW YORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT /UNKNOWN HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case 512019CC002262CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Copy Of DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLOW BEND PASCO HOMEOWNERS A is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURIEL , MELISA