This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:29:11 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC VS AGURTO, ROMINA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AGURTO, ROMINA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I, ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Defendant

AGURTO, ROMINA

Not Classified By Court

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Confidential Information

08/11/2021:Notice Of Confidential Information

Civil Cover Sheet

08/11/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/11/2021:Complaint

Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY ATTY OBO PLF

08/11/2021:Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY ATTY OBO PLF

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/11/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/12/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Return of Service on Summons Served ROMINA AGURTO 100121

10/21/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served ROMINA AGURTO 100121

Motion For Default On AGAINST ROMINA AGURTO

12/10/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST ROMINA AGURTO

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

12/10/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

Return of Service on Summons Served 100121 ROMINA AGURTO

12/10/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served 100121 ROMINA AGURTO

Default Entered ROMINA AGURTO

12/17/2021:Default Entered ROMINA AGURTO

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

12/29/2021:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Affidavit As To Costs

12/29/2021:Affidavit As To Costs

Notice of Filing EXHIBIT(S)

12/29/2021:Notice of Filing EXHIBIT(S)

Default Judgment

01/03/2022:Default Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing EXHIBIT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit As To Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered ROMINA AGURTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 100121 ROMINA AGURTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST ROMINA AGURTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ROMINA AGURTO 100121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 081121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY ATTY OBO PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003135CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin