This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 09/18/2020 at 06:04:16 (UTC).

WEST, JAMIE VS US HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 WEST, JAMIE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against US HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST, JAMIE

Defendant

US HOME CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT, JOSHUA EVAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR US HOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point AS OF 08/19/2020 LB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF TO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CA001867CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US HOME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNETT JOSHUA E