This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 15:31:19 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE VS C A SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against C A SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN TENANT 3

UNKNOWN TENANT 4

SANTIAGO, CYNTHIA A

LAKE PADGETT ESTATES EAST PROP

SANTIAGO, FEDERICO E

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

Not Classified By Court

SANTIAGO, CYNTHIA ANN

REAMS, CYNTHIA

SANTIAGO, FRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTILLO, TARA NATASHA

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN, BARBARA MENDELL

MULLIS, BRANDON K

 

Court Documents

Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

12/05/2018:Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

Motion to Withdraw AS COUSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFS FILED BY MARK P STOPA ESQ

10/09/2018:Motion to Withdraw AS COUSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFS FILED BY MARK P STOPA ESQ

Response To Request Production FILED BY PLTF

09/11/2018:Response To Request Production FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

07/19/2018:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

Notice of Change of Attorney JONATHAN JACOBSON ESQ OBO PLTF

07/13/2018:Notice of Change of Attorney JONATHAN JACOBSON ESQ OBO PLTF

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY CYNTHIA SANTIAGO

09/25/2017:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY CYNTHIA SANTIAGO

Order Denying MOTION TO DISMISS

08/28/2017:Order Denying MOTION TO DISMISS

Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLF

12/02/2016:Motion For Extension Of Time FILED BY PLF

Order ON DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 12, 2016 AND TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE HELD ON NOVEMBER 1, 2016

11/23/2016:Order ON DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 12, 2016 AND TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE HELD ON NOVEMBER 1, 2016

Objection TO FORECLOSURE SALE, CERTIFICATE OF SALE, TO ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL; FILED BY DEF

11/09/2016:Objection TO FORECLOSURE SALE, CERTIFICATE OF SALE, TO ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL; FILED BY DEF

Motion To Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT (VERIFIED) FILED BY CYNTHIA A SANTIAGO MS

10/26/2016:Motion To Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT (VERIFIED) FILED BY CYNTHIA A SANTIAGO MS

Motion To Dismiss FILED BY CYNTHIA A. SANTIAGO

10/26/2016:Motion To Dismiss FILED BY CYNTHIA A. SANTIAGO

Request To Produce FILED BY CYNTHIA A SANTIAGO

10/26/2016:Request To Produce FILED BY CYNTHIA A SANTIAGO

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

10/26/2016:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 110116

09/13/2016:Uniform Final Judgment Of Foreclosure 110116

Final Disposition Form

09/13/2016:Final Disposition Form

Notice Of Hearing 091216 AT 1055AM

08/23/2016:Notice Of Hearing 091216 AT 1055AM

Certificate Of Compliance With Foreclosure Procedu

07/15/2016:Certificate Of Compliance With Foreclosure Procedu

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail FOR FEDERICO SANTIAGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting MOTIO TO CONTINUE TRIAL 060619

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketReopened for Other Reopen Cause on 4/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion To Continue OF TRIAL FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Service PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketWitness List PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketList Of Exhibits PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest FOR TRIAL EXHIBITS AND PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketWitness and Exhibit List FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/23/2019; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 10/09/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 12/02/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 11/09/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 10/26/2016; Reopen Close Date: 11/23/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE PADGETT ESTATES EAST PROP is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARBARA M BROWN, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLIS , BRANDON K