Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:18:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS BORGES, WILFREDO

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BORGES, WILFREDO. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

BORGES, WILFREDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PADRON, REY

 

Court Documents

Affidavit As To Costs

07/17/2019:Affidavit As To Costs

Default Entered AGAINST WILFREDO BORGES

01/16/2019:Default Entered AGAINST WILFREDO BORGES

Affidavit of Attorney Fees

07/17/2019:Affidavit of Attorney Fees

Motion For Default On ON WILFREDO BORGES

01/10/2019:Motion For Default On ON WILFREDO BORGES

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

07/24/2019:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, WILFREDO BORGES

11/21/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, WILFREDO BORGES

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

11/20/2018:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • Default Entered AGAINST WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Motion For Default On ON WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 113018 WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK FOR DEFENDANT / WILFREDO BORGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004537CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less