This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:32:08 (UTC).

WEGESCHEIDE, TYRONE VS ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 WEGESCHEIDE, TYRONE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEGESCHEIDE, TYRONE

Defendants

MCGOVERN, STEVE

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESS

MCGOVERN, RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTMAN, THOMAS PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY RENEE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY STEVE MCGOVERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint on Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint on Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002491CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less