This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 06/02/2022 at 06:06:04 (UTC).

WARFORD, TAMARA VS BLISS, ARTHUR Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 WARFORD, TAMARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BLISS, ARTHUR. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARFORD, TAMARA

Defendants

BLISS, ARTHUR

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALKI, AFRAM

Defendant Attorney

LEDOUX, CHERYL ANN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

05/03/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

05/03/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/03/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/03/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Request For Production FILED BY PLF

05/03/2022:Request For Production FILED BY PLF

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ARTHUR BLISS

05/03/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ARTHUR BLISS

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLF

05/03/2022:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLF

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

05/04/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

05/04/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO ARTHUR BLISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Production FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA001136CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LeDoux, Cheryl Ann