This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:33:41 (UTC).

WALTER, EUGENE VS KISH, MARK Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 WALTER, EUGENE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KISH, MARK. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER, EUGENE

Defendants

PERT, ASHLEY

KISH, MARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing 101320 @ 2:30 PM

09/29/2020:Notice of Hearing 101320 @ 2:30 PM

Complaint for Eviction

09/18/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 102320 @ 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder DETERMINING RENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDefault Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCopy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 101320 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On ASHLEY PERT AND MARK KISH / COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On ASHLEY PERT AND MARK KISH / CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served (POSTED) ASHLEY PERT 091920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served (POSTED) MARK KISH 091920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer ASHLEY PERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service FOR DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service FOR DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002490CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less