This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:01:10 (UTC).

VICICH, DIANA, VICICH, LUCILLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2021 VICICH, DIANA, VICICH, LUCILLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Decedents

VICICH, LUCILLE

VICICH, LUCILLE J

Not Classified By Court

VICICH, DIANA

VICICH, RICHARD J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY PINELLAS COUNTY EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES AUTHORITY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,140.96 ATTORNEY SERVED VIA FSX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketInventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of NTC on Florida AHCA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAMENDED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR RJV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR WJV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION RJV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP001728CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R