Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:48:36 (UTC).

VERONA, CANDY VS WEISS, MARK RICHARD

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 VERONA, CANDY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEISS, MARK RICHARD. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONA, CANDY

Defendant

WEISS, MARK RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Pre-Trial Conference Order PTC RESET 02/27/2019 @ 2:30 PM

01/11/2019:Pre-Trial Conference Order PTC RESET 02/27/2019 @ 2:30 PM

Statement Of Claim; VERONA CANDY

11/13/2018:Statement Of Claim; VERONA CANDY

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/11/2019 @ 2:30 PM; WEISS MARK RICHARD

11/13/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/11/2019 @ 2:30 PM; WEISS MARK RICHARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • Order Denying FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order TRIAL 04/04/2019 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Copy Of AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; WEISS MARK RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order PTC RESET 02/27/2019 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004089SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim; VERONA CANDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 01/11/2019 @ 2:30 PM; WEISS MARK RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Event Date: 02/27/2019 14:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Event Date: 01/11/2019 14:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: ES C

    Read MoreRead Less