This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/24/2019 at 06:03:08 (UTC).

VANDERSCHOUW TURNER, LORELEI VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 VANDERSCHOUW TURNER, LORELEI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERSCHOUW TURNER, LORELEI

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUL, SUMEET

 

Court Documents

Request For Admissions

03/20/2019:Request For Admissions

Request To Produce

03/20/2019:Request To Produce

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Request For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Request To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Notice OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice Of Service Of Process On The Insurance Comm 040419 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case 512019CA000955CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less