This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 16:26:53 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS PIO ROBLES, LISA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PIO ROBLES, LISA J. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER and BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

PIO ROBLES, LISA J

PIO ROBLES, MAURO F

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Not Classified By Court

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 20

ROBLES, LISA PIO

INFANTE, LISA J

ROBLES, MAURO PIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK, CHRISTOPHER TADEUS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

09/09/2021:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

Default Entered

08/13/2021:Default Entered

Notice of Dropping Party or Parties

08/10/2021:Notice of Dropping Party or Parties

Motion DEFENDANT/BORROWERS MOTION FOR MEDIATION OF A RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CASE

07/30/2021:Motion DEFENDANT/BORROWERS MOTION FOR MEDIATION OF A RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CASE

Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 2

07/22/2021:Return of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Return of Service on Summons Served LISA PIA ROBLES 072021 NMA

07/22/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served LISA PIA ROBLES 072021 NMA

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

06/04/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

06/04/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR LISA J PIO ROBLES A/K/A LISA PIO ROBLES F/K/A LISA J INFANTE

06/04/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR LISA J PIO ROBLES A/K/A LISA PIO ROBLES F/K/A LISA J INFANTE

Certificate of Possession of Note

06/02/2021:Certificate of Possession of Note

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

06/02/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

06/02/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

06/02/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Form B Notice To Homeowner

06/02/2021:Form B Notice To Homeowner

Value Calculation for Real Property

06/02/2021:Value Calculation for Real Property

Verified Complaint

06/02/2021:Verified Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

06/02/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Notice Of Lis Pendens

06/02/2021:Notice Of Lis Pendens

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service MAURO PIO ROBLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party or Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On DEF MAURO F PIO ROBLES AKA MAURO PIO ROBLES W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion DEFENDANT/BORROWERS MOTION FOR MEDIATION OF A RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm B Notice To Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNew Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Calculation for Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001301CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-GS3 is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK, CHRISTOPHER TADEUS