Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 09/23/2019 at 06:00:35 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS CHU CECILIA L UNKNOWN SPOUSE O Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CHU CECILIA L UNKNOWN SPOUSE O. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

CHU LIBERATO V UNKNOWN SPOUSE

CHU, CECILIA L

SUMMER LAKES TRACT 9 HOMEOWNER

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

CHU, LIBERATO V

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CHU CECILIA L UNKNOWN SPOUSE O

Not Classified By Court

CHALET SERIES III TRUST

CHU, LIBERATO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELLEWELL, CHRISTOPHAL CALVIN KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

08/19/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CECILIA L CHU ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANT #1 ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To SUMMER LAKES TRACT 9 HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To CECILIA L CHU ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LIBERATO V CHU ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To LIBERATO V CHU ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Value Calculation for Real Property PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Certificate of Possession of Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Form B Notice To Homeowner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • New Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Verified Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS A-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case 512019CA002791CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMER LAKES TRACT 9 HOMEOWNER is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHALET SERIES III TRUST AS TRUSTEE is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant