This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 12:23:17 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS E ALLEN

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against E ALLEN. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, KEMBA JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A

Defendants

GRAND OAKS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

GRAND OAKS MASTER ASSOCIATION

ALLEN, ELVALYN

KEATHEL CHAUNCEY ESQ AS TRUSTE

ALLEN ELVALYN UNKNOWN SPOUSE O

Not Classified By Court

RESIDENTIAL ASSET SECURITIES C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

Defendant Attorneys

MORRELL, CLINTON SCOTT

GROVE, UTA S

 

Court Documents

Copy Of UNSIGNED DEFAULT

11/13/2015:Copy Of UNSIGNED DEFAULT

Motion For Default On GRAND OAKS ASSOCIATION INC W/UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

11/12/2015:Motion For Default On GRAND OAKS ASSOCIATION INC W/UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

Order ON MOTION TO INTERVENE, JOIN OR SUBSTITUTE AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

10/19/2015:Order ON MOTION TO INTERVENE, JOIN OR SUBSTITUTE AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint FILED BY PLTF

10/16/2015:Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint FILED BY PLTF

Motion For Default On GRAND OAKS ASSOCIATION INC W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

11/11/2015:Motion For Default On GRAND OAKS ASSOCIATION INC W/ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

Motion To Dismiss FILED BY KEATHEL CHAUNCEY ESQ

11/02/2015:Motion To Dismiss FILED BY KEATHEL CHAUNCEY ESQ

Certificate Of Mailing

09/08/2015:Certificate Of Mailing

Correspondence To Press For Publication BUSINESS OBSERVER BEGINNING 9/11/15

09/08/2015:Correspondence To Press For Publication BUSINESS OBSERVER BEGINNING 9/11/15

Proof Of Publication

09/21/2015:Proof Of Publication

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCorrespondence RETURNING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE MOTION TO DIRECT CLERK OF COURT TO RELEASE AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Limited Appearance FILED BY JONATHAN B NUNN ESQ OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketMotion To Release Originals FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketReopened for Other Reopen Cause on 3/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRecord Transmitted 17-3531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL DISMISS APPEAL 17-3531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketBILL TO ATTORNEY FOR PROCESSING APPEAL $140.00 TOTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketINDEX ORIGINAL RECORD ON APPEAL 17-3531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA OTSC DISCHARGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint W/EXHIBITS A - D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 03/29/2018; Reopen Close Date: 04/04/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 08/30/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 06/05/2017; Reopen Close Date: 07/19/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAND OAKS MASTER ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Keathel Chauncey Esq As Trustee Under The 12748 La is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarfield, Steven Jay