This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/27/2019 at 20:25:28 (UTC).

US BANK NA VS DAMPIER, DREW Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 US BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DAMPIER, DREW. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NA

Defendants

DAMPIER, JANE ANN

PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF

SUNTRUST BANK

DAMPIER, DREW

Not Classified By Court

LASALLE BANK NA

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUPCINSKAS, ALICIA MARIE

Defendant Attorneys

GEIGER, BRYAN J.

FENTON, KEVIN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

08/07/2017:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Verified Complaint

08/07/2017:Verified Complaint

Summons Issued And Returned To DREW DAMPIER ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

08/10/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To DREW DAMPIER ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons Issued And Returned To JANE ANN DAMPIER ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

08/10/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To JANE ANN DAMPIER ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons Issued And Returned To THE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF LAKE PARKER ESTATES INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

08/10/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To THE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION OF LAKE PARKER ESTATES INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons Issued And Returned To SUNTRUST BANK ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

08/10/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To SUNTRUST BANK ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Return of Service on Summons Served 081117 THE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSN., OF LAKE PARKER ESTATES, INC.

08/31/2017:Return of Service on Summons Served 081117 THE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSN., OF LAKE PARKER ESTATES, INC.

Return of Service on Summons Served 081517 SUNTRUST BANK

08/31/2017:Return of Service on Summons Served 081517 SUNTRUST BANK

Return of Service on Summons Served 081417 NMA DREW DAMPIER

08/31/2017:Return of Service on Summons Served 081417 NMA DREW DAMPIER

Return of Service on Summons Served 081417 NMA JANE ANN DAMPIER

08/31/2017:Return of Service on Summons Served 081417 NMA JANE ANN DAMPIER

Default Entered AGAINST SUNTRUST BANK

01/17/2018:Default Entered AGAINST SUNTRUST BANK

Response to Motion TO DISMISS PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

01/31/2018:Response to Motion TO DISMISS PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

Order Setting Non Jury Trial ON 021319 AT 9 AM

08/22/2018:Order Setting Non Jury Trial ON 021319 AT 9 AM

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR Voluntary Dismissal AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

01/22/2019:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR Voluntary Dismissal AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/13/2019

DocketFinal Disposition Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2019

DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2019

DocketCertificate Of Service FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2019

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR Voluntary Dismissal AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2019

DocketMotion FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018

DocketReturn of Service on Subpoena Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2018

DocketReturn of Service on Subpoena Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2018

DocketWitness and Exhibit List FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2018

DocketWitness and Exhibit List FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
08/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketVerified Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketNotice of Filing Original Note and Mortgage

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketForm C Notice to Homeowner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketForm D Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketCopy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2017

DocketFile Verified To This Point MFC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less