This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 11:32:54 (UTC).

UCIC, WILLIAM G JR VS UCIC, KERRI L

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 UCIC, WILLIAM G JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against UCIC, KERRI L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UCIC, WILLIAM G JR

Defendant

UCIC, KERRI L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Answer TO PETITION AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BY NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN FILED BY RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Social Security Number

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Financial Affidavit NTC OF FILING FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Answer FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Order For Temporary Standing No Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 041019 KERRI L UCIC NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice of Filing FILED BY WILLIAM G UCIC JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To KERRI L UCIC RET ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019DR001828DRAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Family Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Petitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance FILED BY BRUCE E PRZEPIS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address FILED BY BRUCE E PRZEPIS ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD