This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/28/2019 at 08:31:00 (UTC).

TUCKER, ROSE M Et Al VS FIELDS, BEATRICE

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 TUCKER, ROSE M filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FIELDS, BEATRICE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TUCKER, ROSE M

TUCKER, SINCLAIR

Defendant

FIELDS, BEATRICE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/21/2019:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Default Denied AGAINST BEATRICE *PARTY FILED PAPER*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Motion For Default On BEATRICE FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Hearing 032619 AT 11AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 022319 BEATRICE FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Response FILED BY BEATRICE FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case 512019CC000784CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLF, BEATRICE FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less