This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2022 at 06:01:30 (UTC).

TROXELL, JESSICA VS YOUTH AND FAMILY ALTERNATIVES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 TROXELL, JESSICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOUTH AND FAMILY ALTERNATIVES. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROXELL, JESSICA

Defendant

YOUTH AND FAMILY ALTERNATIVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GACIO, TOMAS LAZARO

Defendant Attorney

BUCHANAN, ROBERT BEST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest For Production FILED BY DEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY DEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY DEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY ROBERT B BUCHANAN ESQ OBO DEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Service OF COMPLAINT ON THE LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served YOUTH AND FAMILIY ALTERNATIVES 021022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY PLF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY PLF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PLF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories TO YOUTH AND FAMILY ALTERNATIVES INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022

DocketCase 512022CA000281CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 2/1/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less