This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:30:54 (UTC).

TREE LANE VILLAGE MOBILE HOME VS ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 TREE LANE VILLAGE MOBILE HOME filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TREE LANE VILLAGE MOBILE HOME

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

SCHELL, CODY

SIMARD, GABRIELLE

Not Classified By Court

SCHELL, CODY LEE

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLF (BY MAIL)

10/14/2020:Writ of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLF (BY MAIL)

Final Judgment

10/14/2020:Final Judgment

Default Entered GABRIELLE SIMARD AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

10/06/2020:Default Entered GABRIELLE SIMARD AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

09/17/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; CODY SCHELL

09/17/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF; CODY SCHELL

Complaint for Eviction

09/17/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession ISSUED AND RETD TO PLF (BY MAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered GABRIELLE SIMARD AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST GABRIELLE SIMARD AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAffidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service GABRIELLE SIMARD AND OTHER OCCUAPNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Returned Served POSTED 091820 ALLL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Returned Served POSTED 091820 CODY SCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Returned Served POSTED 091820 GABRIELLE SIMARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF; ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF; CODY SCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF; GABRIELLE SIMARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002478CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less