This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 06/25/2022 at 06:10:25 (UTC).

TOMASELLO, JOSEPH VS ABBEY, DELANEY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 TOMASELLO, JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABBEY, DELANEY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOMASELLO, JOSEPH

Defendant

ABBEY, DELANEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALKI, AFRAM

Defendant Attorney

PECKHAM, ALEXANDER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

05/26/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint DEMAND JURY TRIAL

05/26/2022:Complaint DEMAND JURY TRIAL

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/26/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Request To Produce

05/26/2022:Request To Produce

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

05/26/2022:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories

Request For Admissions

05/26/2022:Request For Admissions

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

06/01/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Return of Service on Summons Served ON DELANEY ABBEY 060722

06/07/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served ON DELANEY ABBEY 060722

Notice Of Appearance DF

06/20/2022:Notice Of Appearance DF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ON DELANEY ABBEY 060722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint DEMAND JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA001373CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 5/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peckham, Alexander M