Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 14:17:53 (UTC).

TOMASELLO, JOSEPH, TOMASELLO, MARIE J Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 TOMASELLO, JOSEPH, TOMASELLO, MARIE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Decedent

TOMASELLO, MARIE J

Not Classified By Court

TOMASELLO, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE BOND SET $18,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT CLOCK DATE MARCH 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER CLOCK DATE MARCH 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLetter of Clerk's Determination as to Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing - Certificate of Cremation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Concerning Criminal History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Heirs by a Disinterested Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertification of Death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative, Designation of Resident Agent and Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000328CPAXES Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN