This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 08:30:34 (UTC).

TIMBER OAKS FAIRWAY VILLAS I C VS FIRST DOWN REALTY INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 TIMBER OAKS FAIRWAY VILLAS I C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST DOWN REALTY INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMBER OAKS FAIRWAY VILLAS I C

Defendants

TENANT, UNKNOWN

FIRST DOWN REALTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOX, JESSICA L

 

Court Documents

Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

04/12/2019:Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/18/2019:Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/UNKNOWN TENANT

Final Disposition Form

07/02/2019:Final Disposition Form

Returned Mail JASON SUARNEIT

08/16/2019:Returned Mail JASON SUARNEIT

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; UNKNOWN TENANT

04/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; UNKNOWN TENANT

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FIRST DOWN REALTY INC

04/15/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FIRST DOWN REALTY INC

Notice Of Lis Pendens

04/08/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Unserved FOR DEFENDANT/UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Copy Of LISTING COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FIRST DOWN REALTY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019CC001463CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Complaint FOR FORECLOSURE W/EXHIBITS A - D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNOX , JESSICA L